US HB1206 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-239.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-239.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013 - Grants the Secretary of the Interior permanent authority to authorize any state to issue electronic duck stamps. Sets forth state electronic duck stamp application requirements. Allows the Secretary to determine the number of new states permitted per year to participate in the electronic duck stamp program. Instructs the Secretary to require electronic stamp revenue and customer information collected by each state to be transmitted in accordance with a written agreement between the Secretary and the state.
Title
Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 401 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-239. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6840) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 343. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 113-145. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2013-06-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-06-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 184). (text: CR H2994-2995) |
2013-06-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3000-3001) |
2013-06-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-06-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1206. |
2013-06-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2994-2996) |
2013-06-03 | House | Mr. Wittman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 43. |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-67. |
2013-04-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB738 (Same As) 2013-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1335 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
HB3197 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1660 (Related) 2013-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
SB1996 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 304.
SB2363 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Cloture on the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 41 - 56. Record Vote Number: 220. (consideration: CR S4377-4378; text: CR S4377)
SB1335 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
HB3197 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1660 (Related) 2013-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB3590 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
SB1996 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 304.
SB2363 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Cloture on the bill not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 41 - 56. Record Vote Number: 220. (consideration: CR S4377-4378; text: CR S4377)
Subjects
Animals
Art, artists, authorship
Birds
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Art, artists, authorship
Birds
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection