US HB1204 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-238.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-238.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aviation Security Stakeholder Participation Act of 2014 - Directs the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security (Transportation Security Administration [TSA]) to establish in the TSA an aviation security advisory committee. Requires the Assistant Secretary to consult with the Advisory Committee on aviation security matters. Requires the Advisory Committee to develop, upon the Assistant Secretary's request, recommendations to improve aviation security. Requires the Assistant Secretary to appoint to the Advisory Committee members representing up to 34 member organizations, including air carriers, all-cargo air transportation, indirect air carriers, labor organizations representing air carrier employees as well as those representing transportation security officers, aircraft manufacturers, airport operators, airport construction and maintenance contractors as well as labor organizations representing them, general aviation, privacy organizations, the travel industry, airport-based businesses, businesses that conduct security operations at airports, aeronautical repair stations, passenger advocacy groups, the aviation security technology industry (including screening technology and biometrics), victims of terrorist acts against aviation, and law enforcement and security experts. Establishes within the Advisory Committee: (1) an air cargo security subcommittee; (2) a general aviation subcommittee; (3) an airport perimeter security and access control subcommittee; and (4) a security technology subcommittee. Requires all subcommittees to consider risk-based security approaches in the performance of their functions with respect to transportation security.
Title
Aviation Security Stakeholder Participation Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 416 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 411 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 411 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-238. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 5 (Roll no. 560). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8973-8974) |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8993-8994) |
2014-12-10 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 1204. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Mr. Hudson moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8973-8975) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6400-6401) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | S.AMDT.3977 Amendment SA 3977 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | S.AMDT.3977 Amendment SA 3977 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Rockefeller. (consideration: CR S6400-6401)In the nature of a substitute. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6400-6401) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2013-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 3 (Roll no. 617). (text: CR H7414-7415) |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7427-7428) |
2013-12-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1204. |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7414-7418) |
2013-12-03 | House | Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-12-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199. |
2013-12-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-278. |
2013-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-24 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2013-07-24 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2013-03-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E304) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1804 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 598.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security