US HB1162 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government Accountability Office Improvement Act - Authorizes the Comptroller General to: (1) obtain federal agency records required to discharge his or her duties (including audit, evaluation, and investigative duties), including through bringing civil actions under this Act, (2) make and retain copies of agency records, and (3) administer oaths when investigating fraud or federal employee misconduct. States that no provision of the Social Security Act or the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act shall be construed to limit, amend, or supersede the Comptroller General's authority to obtain any information, inspect, or copy any record under this Act. Requires the Comptroller General to prescribe policies and procedures to protect from public disclosure proprietary or trade secret information obtained pursuant to the authority of the Government Accountability Office (GAO). Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed to: (1) alter or amend the prohibitions against the disclosure of trade secret or other sensitive information prohibited by federal and other applicable laws; or (2) affect the applicability of this Act, including the protections against unauthorized disclosure to obtained information. Requires agency statements on actions taken or planned in response to Comptroller General recommendations to be submitted to the congressional committees with jurisdiction over the pertinent agency program or activity and to GAO.
Title
Government Accountability Office Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 408 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 264. |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 113-128. |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 0 (Roll no. 103). (text: CR H1998) |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2010-2011) |
2013-04-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-04-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1162. |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1998-1999) |
2013-04-15 | House | Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 22. |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-36. |
2013-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional oversight
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Trade secrets and economic espionage
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional oversight
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Trade secrets and economic espionage