US HB1103 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-27 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act (ANCSA) to recognize Alexander Creek, Alaska, as a Native village eligible for land and benefits under the Act. Requires Alexander Creek to file any amendments to its corporate charter in Alaska that are necessary to convert from a Native group to a Native Village Corporation. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to negotiate an agreement with Alexander Creek to settle aboriginal land claims and any other claims of such Native Village Corporation against the United States fairly and equitably. Requires Alexander Creek to notify each member of the Native village that: (1) all of them will cease to receive benefits from Cook Inlet Region Incorporated (CIRI) individually as at-large shareholders, and (2) all future resource payments from the Region will be made to the Village Corporation. Relieves CIRI from liability under any state, federal, or local law for damages related to that payment cessation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act to provide that Alexander Creek, Alaska, is and shall be recognized as an eligible Native village under that Act, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2014-02-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2014-02-27HouseSubcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
2013-07-23HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2013-03-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
2013-03-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback