US HB1098 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-13 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Free Competition in Currency Act of 2011- Repeals the federal law establishing U.S. coins, currency, and reserve notes as legal tender for all debts, public charges, taxes, and dues. Prohibits any tax on any coin, medal, token, or gold, silver, platinum, palladium, or rhodium bullion issued by a state, the United States, a foreign government, or any other person. Prohibits states from assessing any tax or fee on any currency or other monetary instrument that is used in interstate or foreign commerce and that has legal tender status under the Constitution. Repeals provisions of the federal criminal code relating to uttering coins of gold, silver, or other metal for use as current money and making or possessing likenesses of such coins. Abates any current prosecution under such provisions and nullifies any previous convictions.
Title
Free Competition in Currency Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2011-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology. |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-03-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E483-484) |
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Metals
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Metals
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1098/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1098/BILLS-112hr1098ih.pdf |