US HB1095 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
TSA Loose Change Act - Directs the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security (Transportation Security Administration [TSA] ) to transfer annually, based on requests for proposals, unclaimed money recovered at airport security checkpoints to nonprofit organizations that operate multiple airport centers throughout the United States to provide places of rest and recuperation for Armed Forces members and their families. (Currently, such moneys are retained by the TSA for civil aviation security.) Amends the Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2005 to repeal the requirement that the TSA Administrator report annually to Congress on how unclaimed money is being used to provide civil aviation security. Requires the Administrator, instead, to report on the amount of money transferred to nonprofit organizations.
Title
TSA Loose Change Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2013-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7407) |
2013-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1095. |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7407-7409) |
2013-12-03 | House | Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-11-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195. |
2013-11-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-274. |
2013-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation Security Discharged. |
2013-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security. |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Currency
Military personnel and dependents
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Currency
Military personnel and dependents
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security