TX SB981 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to electric utility bill payment assistance programs for certain veterans burned in combat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to electric utility bill payment assistance programs for certain veterans burned in combat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - SB 981Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-20HouseRecord vote
2013-05-20HousePassed
2013-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2013-04-08HouseRead first time
2013-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-04SenateRecord vote
2013-04-04SenatePassed
2013-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-04SenateRecord vote
2013-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-03-12SenateRead first time
2013-03-01SenateFiled
2013-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback