TX SB953 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of the Uniform Trade Secrets Act.
Title
Relating to the adoption of the Uniform Trade Secrets Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - SB 953Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-22 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Technology |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY'S FEES
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
TEXAS UNIFORM TRADE SECRETS ACT
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
TEXAS UNIFORM TRADE SECRETS ACT