TX SB946 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the right to terminate a lease and avoid liability by a victim of certain sexual offenses or stalking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the right to terminate a lease and avoid liability by a victim of certain sexual offenses or stalking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-17 - SB 946Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 1/1/14
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-22HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2013-05-22SenateRead
2013-05-22SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-20SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17HouseRecord vote
2013-05-17HousePassed
2013-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-17HouseAmended
2013-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-17HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-07HouseReported favorably as amended
2013-05-07HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-05-07HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2013-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-10HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2013-04-10HouseRead first time
2013-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-04SenateRecord vote
2013-04-04SenatePassed
2013-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-04SenateRecord vote
2013-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-04-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2013-03-12SenateRead first time
2013-02-28SenateFiled
2013-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback