TX SB929 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to equal opportunity for access by home-schooled students to University Interscholastic League-sponsored activities; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to equal opportunity for access by home-schooled students to University Interscholastic League-sponsored activities; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17HouseNo action taken in committee
2013-05-01HouseReferred to Public Education
2013-05-01HouseRead first time
2013-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-25SenateRecord vote
2013-04-25SenatePassed
2013-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-25SenateRecord vote
2013-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-28SenateNo action taken in committee
2013-03-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Education
2013-03-12SenateRead first time
2013-02-28SenateFiled
2013-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback