TX SB914 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a behavior improvement plan or a behavioral intervention plan adopted for certain students with an individualized education program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a behavior improvement plan or a behavioral intervention plan adopted for certain students with an individualized education program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-10 - SB 914Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-16SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-16HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-16SenateRecord vote
2013-05-16SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2013-05-16SenateRead
2013-05-16SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-13SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-10HouseRecord vote
2013-05-10HousePassed
2013-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-09HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-09HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2013-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-22HouseReferred to Public Education
2013-04-22HouseRead first time
2013-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-18SenateRecord vote
2013-04-18SenatePassed
2013-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-18SenateRecord vote
2013-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-18SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-05SenateReferred to Education
2013-03-05SenateRead first time
2013-02-27SenateFiled
2013-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback