TX SB833 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection of data through the Public Education Information Management System (PEIMS) as to the foster care status of public school students.
Title
Relating to the collection of data through the Public Education Information Management System (PEIMS) as to the foster care status of public school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-17 - House - SB 833Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-09 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE