TX SB766 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensure or certification of volunteer firefighters and members of industrial emergency response teams.
Title
Relating to the licensure or certification of volunteer firefighters and members of industrial emergency response teams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |