TX SB753 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the production of the index of the parties to all suits by the clerk of a district court.
Title
Relating to the production of the index of the parties to all suits by the clerk of a district court.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--District
Courts--Personnel
Electronic Information Systems
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Open Records
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--District
Courts--Personnel
Electronic Information Systems
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Open Records