TX SB70 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reports issued by the comptroller on the effect of certain tax provisions.
Title
Relating to reports issued by the comptroller on the effect of certain tax provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |