TX SB7 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to improving the delivery and quality of certain health and human services, including the delivery and quality of Medicaid acute care services and long-term services and supports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to improving the delivery and quality of certain health and human services, including the delivery and quality of Medicaid acute care services and long-term services and supports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-26 - SB 7Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - SB 7Third Reading House (Y: 68 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-05-21 - SB 7Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - SB 7Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - 2nd Reading Amendment 26 by Leach (Y: 87 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - 2nd Reading Amendment 26 by Leach (Y: 59 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-26HouseRecord vote
2013-05-26HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2013-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2013-05-26HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2013-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-26SenateRecord vote
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2013-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2013-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2013-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2013-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2013-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-23HouseRecord vote
2013-05-23HouseMotion fails
2013-05-23HouseMotion to instruct conferees
2013-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2013-05-22HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-22HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2013-05-22HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2013-05-22SenateSenate appoints conferees
2013-05-22SenateSenate requests conference committee
2013-05-22SenateSenate refuses to concur
2013-05-22SenateRead
2013-05-22SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-21HouseRecord vote
2013-05-21HousePassed as amended
2013-05-21HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-21HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-21HouseAmended
2013-05-21HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-21HouseAmended
2013-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-20HouseRecord vote
2013-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-20HouseRecord vote
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseRecord vote
2013-05-20HouseMotion to table fails
2013-05-20HousePoint of order overruled (amendment)
2013-05-20HousePoint of order overruled (amendment)
2013-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2013-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment)
2013-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseAmended
2013-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-02HouseReferred to Human Services
2013-04-02HouseRead first time
2013-03-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2013-03-25SenateRecord vote
2013-03-25SenatePassed
2013-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-25SenateRecord vote
2013-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-25SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-25SenateAmended
2013-03-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-25SenateAmended
2013-03-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-03-25SenateRead 2nd time
2013-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-03-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-02-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-02-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-02-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-01-28SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2013-01-28SenateRead first time
2013-01-23SenateCo-author authorized
2013-01-16SenateFiled
2013-01-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB7
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00007I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00007S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00007E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00007H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00007F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=997&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=998&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=999&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=1022&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=1172&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=1351&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2013

Bill Comments

feedback