TX SB635 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-16 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-16 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the distribution of certain civil penalties and civil restitution received by the attorney general.
Title
Relating to the distribution of certain civil penalties and civil restitution received by the attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Administration
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Courts
Courts--Administration