TX SB60 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing the placement of a security freeze on the consumer file or other record created or maintained by a consumer reporting agency regarding a person under 16 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing the placement of a security freeze on the consumer file or other record created or maintained by a consumer reporting agency regarding a person under 16 years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-18 Effective on 1/1/14
2013-05-18 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-07 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-07HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-07SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-06SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-06SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-04HouseRecord vote
2013-05-04HousePassed
2013-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-03HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-03HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2013-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-08HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2013-04-08HouseRead first time
2013-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-03-13SenateReported engrossed
2013-03-13SenateRecord vote
2013-03-13SenatePassed
2013-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-13SenateRecord vote
2013-03-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-03-13SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-02-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-02-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-02-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-02-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-02-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-01-28SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-01-28SenateRead first time
2012-11-12SenateFiled
2012-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback