TX SB518 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain brewers and manufacturers to sell beer and ale to ultimate consumers.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain brewers and manufacturers to sell beer and ale to ultimate consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - SB 518Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |