TX SB510 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to passing certain vehicles on a highway; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to passing certain vehicles on a highway; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-04-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2013-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
TRAFFIC CONTROL
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road