TX SB398 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to conforming the eligibility under a major events trust fund of a National Collegiate Athletic Association Division I Football Bowl Subdivision postseason event with the changes to the Bowl Championship Series system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to conforming the eligibility under a major events trust fund of a National Collegiate Athletic Association Division I Football Bowl Subdivision postseason event with the changes to the Bowl Championship Series system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-17 Effective immediately
2013-04-17 Signed by the Governor
2013-04-17 Sent to the Governor
2013-04-17HouseSigned in the House
2013-04-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-04-15SenateReported enrolled
2013-04-15SenateHouse passage reported
2013-04-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-12HouseRecord vote
2013-04-12HousePassed
2013-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-11HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-04-11HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2013-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-02HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2013-04-02HouseRead first time
2013-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-03-13SenateReported engrossed
2013-03-13SenateRecord vote
2013-03-13SenatePassed
2013-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-13SenateRecord vote
2013-03-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-03-13SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-02-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-02-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-02-25SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-02-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-02-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-13SenateReferred to Economic Development
2013-02-13SenateRead first time
2013-02-05SenateFiled
2013-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback