TX SB1648 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the motor fuel tax on compressed natural gas and liquefied natural gas; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the motor fuel tax on compressed natural gas and liquefied natural gas; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General