TX SB158 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the average price below which a newspaper is exempt from the sales tax.
Title
Relating to the average price below which a newspaper is exempt from the sales tax.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |