TX SB152 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the protection and care of persons who are elderly or disabled or who are children.
Title
Relating to the protection and care of persons who are elderly or disabled or who are children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - SB 152Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-17 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed |
2013-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aging
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF