TX SB1484 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for enrollees diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for enrollees diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] |
Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - SB 1484Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | House | Passed |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-13 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety