TX SB1210 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to conditions on the receipt of tuition and fee exemptions and waivers at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to conditions on the receipt of tuition and fee exemptions and waivers at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - SB 1210Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-25SenateRecord vote
2013-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2013-05-25SenateRead
2013-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-22HouseRecord vote
2013-05-22HousePassed
2013-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-05-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-05-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-08HouseMeeting cancelled
2013-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-15HouseReferred to Higher Education
2013-04-15HouseRead first time
2013-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-08SenateRecord vote
2013-04-08SenatePassed
2013-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-08SenateRecord vote
2013-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-08SenateAmended
2013-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-08SenateAmended
2013-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-08SenateAmended
2013-04-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-04-08SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-04SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-03-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-03-26SenateCo-author authorized
2013-03-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-03-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-03-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Higher Education
2013-03-12SenateRead first time
2013-03-06SenateFiled
2013-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback