TX SB1191 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties of health care facilities, health care providers, and the Department of State Health Services with respect to care provided to a sexual assault survivor in an emergency department of a health care facility.
Title
Relating to the duties of health care facilities, health care providers, and the Department of State Health Services with respect to care provided to a sexual assault survivor in an emergency department of a health care facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - SB 1191Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TELEMEDICINE
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES
SEXUAL ASSAULT
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TELEMEDICINE