TX HR57 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Rhonda Russell on her contributions as the founder of Lake Highlands Military Moms.
Title
Honoring Rhonda Russell on her contributions as the founder of Lake Highlands Military Moms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2014-11-24 | House | Filed |