TX HR1537 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the 2013 Texas Commission on the Arts honorees.
Title
Congratulating the 2013 Texas Commission on the Arts honorees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CATACALOS, ROSEMARY
HAVEL, JOSEPH
JOHNSON, CRAIG HELLA
POET LAUREATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
STATE ARTIST
STATE MUSICIAN
WOODSON, JIM
HAVEL, JOSEPH
JOHNSON, CRAIG HELLA
POET LAUREATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
STATE ARTIST
STATE MUSICIAN
WOODSON, JIM