TX HR1419 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honoring Ram Chavez of Corpus Christi for his service to his fellow veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Ram Chavez of Corpus Christi for his service to his fellow veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-26HouseReported enrolled
2013-04-24HouseAdopted
2013-04-24HouseLaid before the House
2013-04-24HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2013-04-22HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2013-04-15HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2013-04-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback