TX HJR53 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment to replace the attorney general on the legislative redistricting board with the commissioner of agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment to replace the attorney general on the legislative redistricting board with the commissioner of agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-20 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-17 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-17 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-16 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-04-16 Amendment(s) considered in committee
2009-04-16 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-16 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-03 Referred to Redistricting
2009-03-03 Read first time
2009-02-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SJR41 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback