TX HCR30 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting prayers, including the use of the word "God," at public gatherings, and displays of the Ten Commandments in public educational institutions and other government buildings.
Title
Supporting prayers, including the use of the word "God," at public gatherings, and displays of the Ten Commandments in public educational institutions and other government buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Mark Keough [R] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | House | No action taken in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2014-11-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HCR30 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HC00030I.htm |