TX HB970 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulation of cottage food products and cottage food production operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulation of cottage food products and cottage food production operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-06 - HB 970Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2013-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-06HouseRecord vote
2013-05-06HousePassed
2013-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-18HouseReferred to Public Health
2013-02-18HouseRead first time
2013-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback