TX HB910 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain direct sales of food to consumers.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain direct sales of food to consumers.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. George Lavender [R] | Rep. John Otto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
FARMERS' MARKETS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FOOD
Health
Health--General
PERMITS
FARMERS' MARKETS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
FOOD
Health
Health--General
PERMITS