TX HB724 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a commission to study unclaimed land grant mineral proceeds.
Title
Relating to the creation of a commission to study unclaimed land grant mineral proceeds.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D] |
Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - HB 724Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Amended |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-22 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Mines & Mineral Resources
ROYALTIES
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
UNCLAIMED MINERAL PROCEEDS COMMISSION
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Mines & Mineral Resources
ROYALTIES
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
UNCLAIMED MINERAL PROCEEDS COMMISSION