TX HB610 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from license requirements for the sale of certain manufactured housing.
Title
Relating to an exemption from license requirements for the sale of certain manufactured housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - HB 610Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Manufactured Housing
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Manufactured Housing
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--General