TX HB563 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of official oppression.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the offense of official oppression.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB563 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00563I.htm |