TX HB559 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties of a magistrate to inform an arrested person of consequences of a plea of guilty or nolo contendere.
Title
Relating to the duties of a magistrate to inform an arrested person of consequences of a plea of guilty or nolo contendere.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-12 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-28 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-19 | House | Filed |