TX HB525 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection of data relating to military-connected students through the Public Education Information Management System (PEIMS).
Title
Relating to the collection of data relating to military-connected students through the Public Education Information Management System (PEIMS).
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Aycock [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-25 | Effective immediately | |
2013-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-03-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans