TX HB509 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the process for establishing speed limits on roads near certain schools.
Title
Relating to the process for establishing speed limits on roads near certain schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 509Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
SPEED LIMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
SPEED LIMITS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road