TX HB442 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to assignment of certain death benefits payable by the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to assignment of certain death benefits payable by the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - HB 442Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-03-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | No action taken in committee |
2015-03-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
FUNERALS & FUNERAL DIRECTORS
Insurance
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
FUNERALS & FUNERAL DIRECTORS
Insurance
Insurance--Life & Annuities
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees