TX HB388 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duration of protective orders issued in cases of family violence against persons who are subsequently confined or imprisoned.
Title
Relating to the duration of protective orders issued in cases of family violence against persons who are subsequently confined or imprisoned.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-16 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-16 | House | Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-25 | House | Filed |