TX HB385 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement for a dealer general distinguishing number for private sales of an automobile.
Title
Relating to the requirement for a dealer general distinguishing number for private sales of an automobile.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Keough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB385 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00385I.htm |