TX HB3668 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an individual's responsibilities following an accident reasonably likely to result in injury to or death of a person; imposing criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an individual's responsibilities following an accident reasonably likely to result in injury to or death of a person; imposing criminal penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-07 - HB 3668Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenatePassed
2013-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-09SenateReferred to Transportation
2013-05-09SenateRead first time
2013-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-07HouseRecord vote
2013-05-07HousePassed
2013-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-05-06HouseAmended
2013-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-25HouseReferred to Transportation
2013-03-25HouseRead first time
2013-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback