TX HB362 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of adult education and literacy programs from the Texas Education Agency to the Texas Workforce Commission.
Title
Relating to the transfer of adult education and literacy programs from the Texas Education Agency to the Texas Workforce Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R] | Rep. Marisa Marquez [D] |
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-04-19 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADULT EDUCATION
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
LITERACY
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--General
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
LITERACY
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS