TX HB349 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of a portion of U.S. Highway 87 in Howard County as the William B. Crooker Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of a portion of U.S. Highway 87 in Howard County as the William B. Crooker Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-04-30 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-26 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-03-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
HOWARD COUNTY
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
WILLIAM B.
WILLIAM B. CROOKER MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
HOWARD COUNTY
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
WILLIAM B.
WILLIAM B. CROOKER MEMORIAL HIGHWAY