TX HB3357 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of, membership in, and benefits payable by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of, membership in, and benefits payable by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-24 - HB 3357Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - HB 3357Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2013-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-24HouseRecord vote
2013-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateAmended
2013-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateAmended
2013-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2013-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-17SenateReported favorably as amended
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-02HouseRecord vote
2013-05-02HousePassed
2013-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-19HouseReferred to Pensions
2013-03-19HouseRead first time
2013-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback