TX HB325 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of and penalties for possession of 0.35 ounces or less of marihuana.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of and penalties for possession of 0.35 ounces or less of marihuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB325 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00325I.htm |