TX HB3212 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Red River Boundary Compact and the creation of the Red River Boundary Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Red River Boundary Compact and the creation of the Red River Boundary Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - HB 3212Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenatePassed
2013-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-06SenateReferred to Natural Resources
2013-05-06SenateRead first time
2013-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-02HouseRecord vote
2013-05-02HousePassed
2013-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-25HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-25HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2013-03-25HouseRead first time
2013-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback