TX HB3093 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Department of Information Resources and the Legislative Budget Board regarding information resources technologies of state agencies.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Department of Information Resources and the Legislative Budget Board regarding information resources technologies of state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-26 - House - HB 3093Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2013-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Government Organization |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-04 | House | Amended |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Amended |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Technology |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions